Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Domenico Pietromarchi

Deceased

Bishop of Anagni, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Jun 1820Born
1 Jun 184424.0Ordained PriestPriest
31 Mar 187554.8AppointedBishop of Anagni, Italy
25 Apr 187554.8Ordained BishopBishop of Anagni, Italy
7 Feb 189473.6DiedBishop of Anagni, Italy

MicroData Summary for Domenico Pietromarchi (VIAF: 232795947)
Bishop Domenico Pietromarchi (born , died ) Bishop of Anagni

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVelletri
Ordained BishopTor dei Specchi, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 49.6 years
  • a bishop for 18.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1885
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 98
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1875, Number 27

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 9 Mar 2017