Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Luigi de Persiis

Deceased

Bishop of Assisi, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 May 1835Born
18 Sep 185823.3Ordained PriestPriest
22 Jun 189661.1AppointedBishop of Assisi, Italy
5 Jul 189661.1Ordained BishopBishop of Assisi, Italy
31 Oct 190469.4DiedBishop of Assisi, Italy

MicroData Summary for Luigi de Persiis (VIAF: 88794839)
Bishop Luigi de Persiis (born , died ) Bishop of Assisi

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAlatri, Diocese of Alatri
Ordained BishopSacro Cuore di Ges¨ a Castro Pretorio, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 46.1 years
  • a bishop for 8.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1901
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 126
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1896, Number 35

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 12 Jun 2017