Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovane Pereira de Melo

Bishop of Tocantinópolis, Tocatins


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Jan 1959 BornSalinas
24 Mar 199031.2Ordained PriestPriest of Rondonópolis, Mato Grosso, Brazil
4 Mar 200950.1AppointedBishop of Tocantinópolis, Tocatins, Brazil
8 May 200950.3Ordained BishopBishop of Tocantinópolis, Tocatins, Brazil
24 May 200950.4InstalledBishop of Tocantinópolis, Tocatins, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Giovane Pereira de Melo:
Bishop Giovane Pereira de Melo (born ) Bishop of Tocantinópolis

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Tocantinópolis.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 4 Mar 2009
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 198, Number 16,168

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013