Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Raffaele de Palma, O.F.M. Conv. †

Deceased

Bishop of Oria, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
14 Feb 1650AppointedBishop of Oria, Italy
24 Feb 1650Ordained BishopBishop of Oria, Italy
5 Mar 1674DiedBishop of Oria, Italy

MicroData Summary for Raffaele de Palma
Bishop Raffaele de Palma O.F.M. Conv. (died ) Bishop of Oria

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNapoli, Archdiocese of Napoli {Naples}
Ordained BishopSanti XII Apostoli, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 24.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 354
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1650, Number 30
  • ob/c2: AT, 17 Dec 2016
  • b/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 230, Number 19,132

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast