Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Osei-Bonsu

Bishop of Konongo-Mampong


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Feb 1948 BornJamasi
3 Aug 197527.5Ordained PriestPriest
3 Mar 199547.1AppointedBishop of Konongo-Mampong, Ghana
28 May 199547.3Ordained BishopBishop of Konongo-Mampong, Ghana
11 Jun 199547.3InstalledBishop of Konongo-Mampong, Ghana

MicroData Summary for Joseph Osei-Bonsu:
Bishop Joseph Osei-Bonsu (born ) Bishop of Konongo-Mampong

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Konongo-Mampong.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 142, Number 12,560

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013