Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Adolfo Alejandro Nouel y Bobadilla

Deceased

Archbishop of Santo Domingo, Dominican Republic

Titular Archbishop of Sergiopolis

Apostolic Delegate to Cuba


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Dec 1862Born
19 Dec 188523.0Ordained PriestPriest of Santo Domingo, Dominican Republic
11 Oct 190441.8AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Santo Domingo, Dominican Republic
11 Oct 190441.8AppointedTitular Archbishop of Methymna
16 Oct 190441.8Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Methymna
20 Aug 190643.6SucceededArchbishop of Santo Domingo, Dominican Republic
15 Mar 190744.2InstalledArchbishop of Santo Domingo, Dominican Republic
3 Nov 191350.8AppointedApostolic Delegate to Cuba
3 Nov 191350.8AppointedApostolic Delegate to Puerto Rico
1915²52.0ResignedApostolic Delegate to Puerto Rico
11 Oct 193572.8ResignedArchbishop of Santo Domingo, Dominican Republic
11 Oct 193572.8AppointedTitular Archbishop of Sergiopolis
26 Jun 193774.5DiedArchbishop of Santo Domingo, Dominican Republic

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Adolfo Alejandro Nouel y Bobadilla
Archbishop Adolfo Alejandro Nouel y Bobadilla (born , died ) Archbishop of Santo Domingo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSanto Domingo

  • a priest for 51.5 years
  • a bishop for 32.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 150, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1904, Number 51

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018