Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Luis Antonio de Mena y Steinkoft

Deceased

Coadjutor Archbishop Emeritus of Santo Domingo, Dominican Republic

Titular Archbishop of Parium


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Jul 1873Born
19 Sep 189623.1Ordained PriestPriest of Santo Domingo, Dominican Republic
21 Apr 192248.7AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Santo Domingo, Dominican Republic
21 Apr 192248.7AppointedTitular Archbishop of Parium
25 Sep 192249.1Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Parium
1932²58.4ResignedCoadjutor Archbishop of Santo Domingo, Dominican Republic
7 May 194268.7DiedCoadjutor Archbishop Emeritus of Santo Domingo, Dominican Republic

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Luis Antonio de Mena y Steinkoft
Archbishop Luis Antonio de Mena y Steinkoft (born , died ) Coadjutor Archbishop Emeritus of Santo Domingo

EventPlace
Birth PlacePuerto Plata
Ordained BishopSanto Domingo, Archdiocese of Santo Domingo

  • a priest for 45.6 years
  • a bishop for 19.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1941
  • c2: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1932
  • b/c2+: CB
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1922, Number 57
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 60, Number 4,549

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast