Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Julien Marie Amédée Nouailles, SS.CC. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Tahiti {Isole Tahiti}, French Polynesia

Titular Bishop of Furnos Maior


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Jun 1876BornElven, France
26 Apr 193255.8AppointedVicar Apostolic of Tahiti {Isole Tahiti}, French Polynesia, Pacific (Oceania)
26 Apr 193255.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Furnos Maior
28 Aug 193256.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Furnos Maior
14 Aug 193761.1DiedVicar Apostolic of Tahiti {Isole Tahiti}, French Polynesia, Pacific (Oceania)

MicroData Summary for Julien Marie Amédée Nouailles:
Bishop Julien Marie Amédée Nouailles SS.CC. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Tahiti {Isole Tahiti}

  • a bishop for 5.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1932, Number 59

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013