Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Bernardin Castanié, C.I.M. †

Deceased

Prefect of Cook Islands, Pacific (Oceania)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 Jan 1869Born
18 Oct 189223.7Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of Jesus and Mary
1 Feb 192354.0AppointedPrefect of Cook e Mnihiki, Cook Islands, Pacific (Oceania)
193969.9DiedPrefect of Cook Islands, Pacific (Oceania)

MicroData Summary for Bernardin Castanié
Father Bernardin Castanié C.I.M. (born , died 1939) Prefect of Cook Islands

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBozouls, France

  • a priest for 46.2 years

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1937
  • b: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1932

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018