Catholic-Hierarchy DC

[Constitutional Bishop François Nicolas] †

Civil Constitution of the Clergy

Not in Union with the Holy See

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of [Meurthe (Constitutional), France]


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Sep 1741Born
1800¹58.2SelectedBishop of [Meurthe (Constitutional), France]
2 Feb 180058.3Ordained BishopBishop of [Meurthe (Constitutional), France]
1801²59.2ResignedBishop of [Meurthe (Constitutional), France]
24 Jul 180765.8DiedBishop Emeritus of [Meurthe (Constitutional), France]

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for François Nicolas (VIAF: 45473387)
Bishop François Nicolas (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Meurthe

EventPlace
Birth PlaceEpinal
Ordained BishopNancy
Death PlaceNancy

  • a bishop for 7.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1800, Number 3

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast