Catholic-Hierarchy DC

[Constitutional Bishop Jean Antoine Maudru] †

Civil Constitution of the Clergy

Not in Union with the Holy See

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of [Vosges (Constitutional), France]


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 May 1748Born
1 Mar 179142.8SelectedBishop of [Vosges (Constitutional), France]
20 Mar 179142.8Ordained BishopBishop of [Vosges (Constitutional), France]
1801²52.6ResignedBishop of [Vosges (Constitutional), France]
13 Sep 182072.3DiedBishop Emeritus of [Vosges (Constitutional), France]

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jean Antoine Maudru (VIAF: 32106208)
Bishop Jean Antoine Maudru (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Vosges

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAdompt
Ordained BishopOratoire, Paris, Archdiocese of Paris
Death PlaceParis, Archdiocese of Paris

  • a bishop for 29.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1791, Number 19

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 14 Oct 2018

Quantcast