Catholic-Hierarchy DC

[Constitutional Bishop Nicolas Francin] †

Civil Constitution of the Clergy

Not in Union with the Holy See

Deceased

Bishop of [Moselle (Constitutional), France]


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Sep 1735Born
16 Mar 179155.4SelectedBishop of [Moselle (Constitutional), France]
3 Apr 179155.5Ordained BishopBishop of [Moselle (Constitutional), France]
24 Aug 180266.9DiedBishop of [Moselle (Constitutional), France]

MicroData Summary for Nicolas Francin (VIAF: 54257323)
Bishop Nicolas Francin (born , died ) Bishop of Moselle

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKonigsmachern
Ordained BishopNotre-Dame, Paris, Archdiocese of Paris
Death PlaceMetz

  • a bishop for 11.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1,791, Number 39

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast