Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Amangi Nacua, O.F.M. Cap.

Bishop Emeritus of Ilagan, Philippines


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Jan 1945 Born
16 Sep 196722.6ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
26 Jun 197126.4Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
10 Jun 200863.4AppointedBishop of Ilagan, Philippines
19 Aug 200863.6Ordained BishopBishop of Ilagan, Philippines
9 Sep 200863.6InstalledBishop of Ilagan, Philippines
25 Feb 201772.1ResignedBishop of Ilagan, Philippines

MicroData Summary for Joseph Amangi Nacua
Bishop Joseph Amangi Nacua O.F.M. Cap. (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Ilagan

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMankayan

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Ilagan.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 10 Jun 2008
  • ob/c2+/i: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 195, Number 15,950
  • r: Bollettino, 25 Feb 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 25 Feb 2017