Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Maurice Muhatia Makumba

Bishop of Nakuru


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 May 1968 BornLirhanda
15 Oct 199426.4Ordained PriestPriest of Kakamega, Kenya
19 Dec 200941.6AppointedBishop of Nakuru, Kenya
27 Feb 201041.8Ordained BishopBishop of Nakuru, Kenya

MicroData Summary for Maurice Muhatia Makumba:
Bishop Maurice Muhatia Makumba (born ) Bishop of Nakuru

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Nakuru.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 19 Dec 2009
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 201, Number 16,578

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013