Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Paul Bergan Misner, C.M. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Yükiang [Yujiang]

Titular Bishop of Myrica


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Jan 1891BornPeoria, IL, USA
191119.9ProfessedMember of Congregation of the Mission
23 Feb 191928.0Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Mission
10 Dec 193443.8AppointedVicar Apostolic of Yükiang [Yujiang], China
10 Dec 193443.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Myrica
25 Mar 193544.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Myrica
3 Nov 193847.7DiedVicar Apostolic of Yükiang [Yujiang], China

MicroData Summary for Paul Bergan Misner:
Bishop Paul Bergan Misner C.M. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Yükiang [Yujiang]

  • a priest for 19.6 years
  • a bishop for 3.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1937
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1939
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1935, Number 22

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015