Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Paolo Meniconi

Deceased

Bishop of Bagnoregio (Bagnorea)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1629¹BornPerouse
29 Apr 168051.3AppointedBishop of Bagnoregio (Bagnorea), Italy
1 May 168051.3Ordained BishopBishop of Bagnoregio (Bagnorea), Italy
24 Dec 169465.9DiedBishop of Bagnoregio (Bagnorea), Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Paolo Meniconi:
Bishop Giovanni Paolo Meniconi (born 1629, died ) Bishop of Bagnoregio (Bagnorea)

  • a bishop for 14.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 112
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1680, Number 13

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.5, 14 Apr 2015; Data: 16 Apr 2015