Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Aniger de Francisco de Maria Melillo

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Piracicaba, Sao Paulo, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Jun 1911Born
31 Dec 193322.5Ordained PriestPriest
29 May 196048.9AppointedBishop of Piracicaba, Sao Paulo, Brazil
29 Jun 196049.0Ordained BishopBishop of Piracicaba, Sao Paulo, Brazil
11 Jan 198472.5ResignedBishop of Piracicaba, Sao Paulo, Brazil
17 Apr 198573.8DiedBishop Emeritus of Piracicaba, Sao Paulo, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Aniger de Francisco de Maria Melillo
Bishop Aniger de Francisco de Maria Melillo (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Piracicaba

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCampinas

  • a priest for 51.2 years
  • a bishop for 24.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1960, Number 75

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast