Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Nicola de Martino

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Venosa, Italy

Titular Bishop of Samos


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Sep 1818Born
18 Sep 184123.0Ordained PriestPriest
22 Dec 187153.2AppointedBishop of Venosa, Italy
31 Dec 187153.2Ordained BishopBishop of Venosa, Italy
9 Jul 187859.8ResignedBishop of Venosa, Italy
15 Jul 187859.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Samos
10 May 188162.6DiedBishop Emeritus of Venosa, Italy

MicroData Summary for Nicola de Martino (VIAF: 304892885)
Bishop Nicola de Martino (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Venosa

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBuonabitacolo
Ordained BishopSant'Apollinare, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 39.6 years
  • a bishop for 9.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1872, Page 190
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 496, and Page 585
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 214, Number 17,735
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1871, Number 75

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 27 Feb 2017