Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Estanislau Marques Chindekasse, S.V.D.

Bishop of Dundo, Angola


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Aug 1958 Born
1986²27.3Perpetual VowsMember of Society of the Divine Word
22 Nov 198729.2Ordained PriestPriest of Society of the Divine Word
22 Dec 201254.3AppointedBishop of Dundo, Angola
3 Mar 201354.5Ordained BishopBishop of Dundo, Angola
17 Mar 201354.5InstalledBishop of Dundo, Angola

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Estanislau Marques Chindekasse
Bishop Estanislau Marques Chindekasse S.V.D. (born ) Bishop of Dundo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceHuambo

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Dundo.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 22 Dec 2012
  • ob: CB, 22 Jan 2013
  • c1+: CB, 3 Mar 2013
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 213, Number 17,661

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast