Catholic-Hierarchy DC

[Constitutional Bishop Claude Eustache François Marolles] †

Civil Constitution of the Clergy

Not in Union with the Holy See

Deceased

Bishop of [Aisne (Constitutional), France]


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Apr 1753Born
4 Feb 179137.8SelectedBishop of [Aisne (Constitutional), France]
24 Feb 179137.8Ordained BishopBishop of [Aisne (Constitutional), France]
24 Apr 179441.0DiedBishop of [Aisne (Constitutional), France]

MicroData Summary for Claude Eustache François Marolles
Bishop Claude Eustache François Marolles (born , died ) Bishop of Aisne

EventPlace
Birth PlaceS. Quentin
Ordained BishopOratoire, Paris, Archdiocese of Paris
Death PlaceSoissons

  • a bishop for 3.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,791, Number 2

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast