Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francesco Marino

Bishop of Nola, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Nov 1955 Born
6 Oct 197923.8Ordained PriestPriest of Aversa, Italy
13 Nov 200448.9AppointedBishop of Avellino, Italy
8 Jan 200549.1Ordained BishopBishop of Avellino, Italy
14 Jan 200549.1InstalledBishop of Avellino, Italy
11 Nov 201660.9AppointedBishop of Nola, Italy
15 Jan 201761.1InstalledBishop of Nola, Italy

MicroData Summary for Francesco Marino
Bishop Francesco Marino (born ) Bishop of Nola

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCesa

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Nola.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 178, Number 14,805
  • ab: Bollettino, 11 Nov 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 13 Feb 2017