Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gabriel Akwasi Abiabo Mante

Bishop of Jasikan, Ghana


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Jul 1947 Born
2 Jul 197729.9Ordained PriestPriest
19 Dec 199447.3AppointedBishop of Jasikan, Ghana
28 May 199547.8Ordained BishopBishop of Jasikan, Ghana

MicroData Summary for Gabriel Akwasi Abiabo Mante
Bishop Gabriel Akwasi Abiabo Mante (born ) Bishop of Jasikan

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNkonya-Abenkro

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Jasikan.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 142, Number 12,557

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast