Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francesco Magani

Deceased

Bishop of Parma (-Fontevivo), Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Dec 1828Born
10 Apr 185223.2Ordained PriestPriest
12 Jun 189364.4AppointedBishop of Parma (-Fontevivo), Italy
18 Jun 189364.4Ordained BishopBishop of Parma (-Fontevivo), Italy
12 Dec 190778.9DiedBishop of Parma (-Fontevivo), Italy

MicroData Summary for Francesco Magani (VIAF: 13201867)
Bishop Francesco Magani (born , died ) Bishop of Parma (-Fontevivo)

EventPlace
Birth PlacePavia, Diocese of Pavia
Ordained BishopSt Apollinaire, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 55.6 years
  • a bishop for 14.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1901
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 442
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1893, Number 39

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 30 May 2017