Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop James Hector MacDonald, C.S.C.

Archbishop Emeritus of Saint John’s, Newfoundland, Canada


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Apr 1925 Born
29 Jun 195328.1Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of Holy Cross
9 Feb 197852.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Hamilton, Ontario, Canada
9 Feb 197852.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Gibba
17 Apr 197852.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Gibba
12 Aug 198257.2AppointedBishop of Charlottetown, Prince Edward Island, Canada
7 Oct 198257.4InstalledBishop of Charlottetown, Prince Edward Island, Canada
2 Feb 199165.7AppointedArchbishop of Saint John’s, Newfoundland, Canada
4 Dec 200075.6RetiredArchbishop of Saint John’s, Newfoundland, Canada

MicroData Summary for James Hector MacDonald
Archbishop James Hector MacDonald C.S.C. (born ) Archbishop Emeritus of Saint John’s, Newfoundland

EventPlace
Birth PlaceWhycocomagh

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Saint John’s, Newfoundland.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018