Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Henri de Lespinasse de Saune, S.J. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Tananarive

Titular Bishop of Rhizus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Jul 1850BornToulouse, France
28 Nov 189949.4AppointedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Central Madagascar {Madagascar Centrale}, Madagascar
28 Nov 189949.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Rhizaeum
18 Feb 190049.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Rhizus
30 Aug 191161.1SucceededVicar Apostolic of Central Madagascar {Madagascar Centrale}, Madagascar
10 May 191362.8AppointedVicar Apostolic of Tananarive, Madagascar
7 Mar 192776.7RetiredVicar Apostolic of Tananarive, Madagascar
7 Aug 192979.1DiedVicar Apostolic Emeritus of Tananarive, Madagascar

MicroData Summary for Henri de Lespinasse de Saune:
Bishop Henri de Lespinasse de Saune S.J. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Tananarive

  • a bishop for 29.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 481

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013