Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Mathurin-Marie Le Mailloux, C.S.Sp. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Douala

Titular Bishop of Turuzi


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Nov 1878BornTheix, France
27 Oct 190122.9Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Holy Spirit
5 May 193152.4AppointedPrefect of Douala, Cameroon
14 Jun 193253.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Turuzi
14 Jun 193253.5AppointedVicar Apostolic of Douala, Cameroon
8 Sep 193253.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Turuzi
17 Dec 194567.1DiedVicar Apostolic of Douala, Cameroon

MicroData Summary for Mathurin-Marie Le Mailloux:
Bishop Mathurin-Marie Le Mailloux C.S.Sp. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Douala

  • a priest for 44.1 years
  • a bishop for 13.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1941
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1932, Number 60

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013