Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Francisco de la Cuesta, O.S.H. †

Deceased

Bishop of Michoacán, México


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1658²Born
28 Apr 170446.3AppointedArchbishop of Manila, Philippines
1706²48.0Ordained BishopArchbishop of Manila, Philippines
12 Aug 171254.6InstalledArchbishop of Manila, Philippines
27 Sep 172365.7AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Michoacán, México
29 Mar 172466.2InstalledBishop of Michoacán, México
31 May 172466.4DiedBishop of Michoacán, México

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Francisco de la Cuesta
Archbishop Francisco de la Cuesta O.S.H. (born 1658, died ) Bishop of Michoacán

EventPlace
Birth PlaceColmenar de Toledo, Spain
Ordained BishopMexico, Archdiocese of México, Federal District

  • a bishop for 18.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: CB
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 254, and Page 262
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1,700, Page 25, Number 49
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1706, Number 15
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 59, Number 4,380

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast