Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Melchior Jan Kochnowski

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Chełm

Titular Bishop of Dionysias


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Jan 1720BornSzczekowicz
8 Aug 174525.5Ordained DeaconDeacon
10 Aug 174525.5Ordained PriestPriest
17 Jul 177555.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Chełm, Poland
17 Jul 177555.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Dionysias
22 Oct 177555.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Dionysias
30 Apr 178868.2DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Chełm, Poland

MicroData Summary for Melchior Jan Kochnowski:
Bishop Melchior Jan Kochnowski (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Chełm

  • a priest for 42.7 years
  • a bishop for 12.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 153, Number 13,413
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 197, and Page 453
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 195, Number 15,895
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1775, Number 44

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 30 Dec 2015