Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antoni Wacław Betański

Deceased

Bishop of Przemyśl


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Jun 1715³BornWielisz
9 Mar 174832.7Ordained DeaconDeacon
30 Mar 174832.7Ordained PriestPriest
5 Aug 178065.1SelectedCoadjutor Bishop of Przemyśl, Poland
2 Apr 178165.8ConfirmedCoadjutor Bishop of Przemyśl, Poland
2 Apr 178165.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Troas
19 Aug 178166.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Troas
16 Jan 178367.5SucceededBishop of Przemyśl, Poland
22 Jan 178670.6DiedBishop of Przemyśl, Poland

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Antoni Wacław Betański:
Bishop Antoni Wacław Betański (born , died ) Bishop of Przemyśl

  • a priest for 37.8 years
  • a bishop for 4.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 348, and Page 418
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1781, Number 18

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 30 Dec 2015