Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Sebastian Kallupura

Bishop of Buxar, India


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Jul 1953 Born
14 May 198430.8Ordained PriestPriest of Patna, India
7 Apr 200955.7AppointedBishop of Buxar, India
21 Jun 200955.9Ordained BishopBishop of Buxar, India

MicroData Summary for Sebastian Kallupura
Bishop Sebastian Kallupura (born ) Bishop of Buxar

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKottiyoor

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Buxar.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 7 Apr 2009
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 198, Number 16,194

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018