Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Charles-Constant Jolivet, O.M.I. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Natal, South Africa

Titular Bishop of Belline


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Jan 1826Born
1848¹21.9ProfessedMember of Oblates of Mary Immaculate
17 May 184923.3Ordained PriestPriest of Oblates of Mary Immaculate
15 Sep 187448.6AppointedVicar Apostolic of Natal, South Africa
15 Sep 187448.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Belline
30 Nov 187448.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Belline
15 Sep 190377.6DiedVicar Apostolic of Natal, South Africa

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Charles-Constant Jolivet
Bishop Charles-Constant Jolivet O.M.I. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Natal

EventPlace
Birth PlacePont-l'Abbé, France
Ordained BishopOMI Chapel, rue de St Petersburg, Paris, Archdiocese of Paris, France

  • a priest for 54.3 years
  • a bishop for 28.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 145
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1874, Number 56

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 15 May 2017