Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ricardo Hoepers

Bishop of Rio Grande, Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Dec 1970 Born
19 Apr 199827.3Ordained DeaconDeacon of Curitiba, Parana, Brazil
31 Jan 199928.1Ordained PriestPriest of Curitiba, Parana, Brazil
17 Feb 201645.1AppointedBishop of Rio Grande, Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil
14 May 201645.4Ordained BishopBishop of Rio Grande, Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil
3 Jun 201645.4InstalledBishop of Rio Grande, Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Ricardo Hoepers
Bishop Ricardo Hoepers (born ) Bishop of Rio Grande

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCuritiba

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Rio Grande.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 17 Feb 2016
  • od/c01: CB, 17 Feb 2016
  • ob/i: CB, 18 Feb 2016
  • c2+: CB, 9 Mar 2016
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 228, Number 18,911

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast