Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Matthias Heinrich

Auxiliary Bishop of Berlin

Titular Bishop of Thibaris


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Jun 1954 BornBerlin
198025.5Ordained DeaconDeacon of Berlin, Germany
20 Jun 198127.0Ordained PriestPriest of Berlin, Germany
18 Feb 200954.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Berlin, Germany
18 Feb 200954.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Thibaris
19 Apr 200954.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Thibaris

MicroData Summary for Matthias Heinrich:
Bishop Matthias Heinrich (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Berlin

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Berlin.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 18 Feb 2009
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 198, Number 16,157

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013