Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Reinhard Hauke

Auxiliary Bishop of Erfurt, Germany

Titular Bishop of Flumenpiscense


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Nov 1953 Born
30 Jun 197925.6Ordained PriestPriest of Erfurt, Germany
11 Oct 200551.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Erfurt, Germany
11 Oct 200551.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Flumenpiscense
26 Nov 200552.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Flumenpiscense

MicroData Summary for Reinhard Hauke
Bishop Reinhard Hauke (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Erfurt

EventPlace
Birth PlaceWeimar

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Erfurt.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 11 Oct 2005
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 183, Number 15,012

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast