Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Dominique Banlène Guigbile

Bishop of Dapaong, Togo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Dec 1962 Born
30 Dec 199230.0Ordained PriestPriest of Dapaong, Togo
15 Nov 201653.8AppointedBishop of Dapaong, Togo
4 Feb 201754.0Ordained BishopBishop of Dapaong, Togo
5 Feb 201754.0InstalledBishop of Dapaong, Togo

MicroData Summary for Dominique Banlène Guigbile (VIAF: 44515085)
Bishop Dominique Banlène Guigbile (born ) Bishop of Dapaong

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKpandéntangue-B
Ordained BishopNotre-Dames-des-Sources, Church, Daluag

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Dapaong.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 15 Nov 2016
  • ob: CB, 24 Dec 2016
  • c2+: CB, 14 Jan 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 4 Feb 2017