Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jacques Tukumbé Nyimbusède Anyilunda

Bishop Emeritus of Dapaong


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1946 BornKandé
5 Jul 197327.5Ordained PriestPriest
3 Dec 199044.9AppointedBishop of Dapaong, Togo
13 Apr 199145.2Ordained BishopBishop of Dapaong, Togo
15 Nov 201670.8ResignedBishop of Dapaong, Togo

MicroData Summary for Jacques Tukumbé Nyimbusède Anyilunda
Bishop Jacques Tukumbé Nyimbusède Anyilunda (born 1946) Bishop Emeritus of Dapaong

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Dapaong.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 127, Number 11,441
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 128
  • r: Bollettino, 15 Nov 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 15 Nov 2016