Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Chrétien Matawo Bakpessi

Deceased

Bishop of Sokodé


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1924BornYadé
21 Dec 195229.0Ordained PriestPriest
9 Aug 196541.6AppointedBishop of Sokodé, Togo
5 Dec 196541.9Ordained BishopBishop of Sokodé, Togo
27 Apr 199268.3DiedBishop of Sokodé, Togo

MicroData Summary for Chrétien Matawo Bakpessi:
Bishop Chrétien Matawo Bakpessi (died ) Bishop of Sokodé

  • a priest for 39.3 years
  • a bishop for 26.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 133

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013