Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Johannes Gorantla

Deceased

Bishop of Kurnool, India


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Apr 1952Born
19 Mar 197724.9Ordained PriestPriest
6 Dec 199341.6AppointedBishop of Kurnool, India
26 Jan 199441.7Ordained BishopBishop of Kurnool, India
20 Jan 200754.7DiedBishop of Kurnool, India

MicroData Summary for Johannes Gorantla
Bishop Johannes Gorantla (born , died ) Bishop of Kurnool

EventPlace
Birth PlaceManagalapalli

  • a priest for 29.8 years
  • a bishop for 12.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 139, Number 12,338
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 191, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018