Date | Age | Event | Title |
---|---|---|---|
19 Nov 1962 | Born | ||
16 Apr 1990 | 27.4 | Ordained Priest | Priest of Dhaka, Bangladesh |
15 Feb 2024 | 61.2 | Appointed | Auxiliary Bishop of Dhaka, Bangladesh |
15 Feb 2024 | 61.2 | Appointed | Titular Bishop of Tamazuca |
Father
Subroto Boniface
Gomes
(born )
Auxiliary Bishop-Elect
of Dhaka
Event | Place |
---|---|
Birth Place | Rangamatia, Archdiocese of Dacca |
Please contact the Father through the Archdiocese of Dhaka.
|
Source(s):
|
Home |
Countries |
Religious Orders |
Popes |
Holy See |
Roman Curia |
Cardinals by Rank
| ||
About Catholic-Hierarchy | Terminology/Site Help | |
Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2024 Code: web_b, v3.3.5, 31 Dec 2023; Data: 25 Feb 2024 |
✠