Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antoni de Gołaszewski

Deceased

Bishop of Przemyśl, Poland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Jun 1745Born
23 Jul 176924.1Ordained DeaconDeacon
26 Jul 176924.1Ordained PriestPriest
18 Apr 178640.8SelectedBishop of Przemyśl, Poland
24 Jul 178641.1ConfirmedBishop of Przemyśl, Poland
15 Oct 178641.3Ordained BishopBishop of Przemyśl, Poland
25 Apr 182579.8DiedBishop of Przemyśl, Poland

MicroData Summary for Antoni de Gołaszewski
Bishop Antoni de Gołaszewski (born , died ) Bishop of Przemyśl

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGolasze

  • a priest for 55.7 years
  • a bishop for 38.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 348
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1786, Number 20

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018