Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Martin-Marie-Stanislas Gillet, O.P. †

Deceased

Titular Archbishop of Nicaea


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Dec 1875Born
21 Sep 190226.7Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Preachers
21 Sep 192953.7AppointedMaster General of Order of Friars Preachers
30 Sep 194670.7AppointedTitular Archbishop of Nicaea
17 Nov 194670.9Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Nicaea
3 Sep 195175.7DiedTitular Archbishop of Nicaea

MicroData Summary for Martin-Marie-Stanislas Gillet
Archbishop Martin-Marie-Stanislas Gillet O.P. (born , died ) Titular Archbishop of Nicaea

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLouppy-sur-Loison, France

  • a priest for 48.9 years
  • a bishop for 4.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1946, Number 97

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018