Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Guglielmo Giaquinta

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Tivoli, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Jul 1914Born
18 Mar 193924.6Ordained PriestPriest
24 Sep 196854.1AppointedApostolic Administrator of Tivoli, Italy
24 Sep 196854.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Hyccarum (Hyccara)
1 Nov 196854.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Hyccarum (Hyccara)
18 Mar 197459.6AppointedBishop of Tivoli, Italy
25 Jun 198772.9ResignedBishop of Tivoli, Italy
15 Jun 199479.8DiedBishop Emeritus of Tivoli, Italy

MicroData Summary for Guglielmo Giaquinta (VIAF: 91539261)
Bishop Guglielmo Giaquinta (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Tivoli

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNoto

  • a priest for 55.2 years
  • a bishop for 25.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 141, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast