Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Lorenzo Ghizzoni

Archbishop of Ravenna-Cervia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Apr 1955 BornCognento
14 Sep 197924.4Ordained PriestPriest of Reggio Emilia, Italy
17 Feb 200650.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Reggio Emilia-Guastalla, Italy
17 Feb 200650.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Ottana
29 Apr 200651.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Ottana
17 Nov 201257.6AppointedArchbishop of Ravenna-Cervia, Italy
20 Jan 201357.7InstalledArchbishop of Ravenna-Cervia, Italy

MicroData Summary for Lorenzo Ghizzoni:
Archbishop Lorenzo Ghizzoni (born ) Archbishop of Ravenna-Cervia

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Ravenna-Cervia.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 17 Feb 2006
  • ob: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 185, Number 15,145
  • ab: Bollettino, 17 Nov 2012
  • c1: CB, 31 Dec 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
Code: web_b, v3.0.1, 18 Dec 2014; Data: 2 Jan 2015