Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Patriarch Grégoire Pierre XX (Krikor) Ghabroyan, I.C.P.B. †

Deceased

Patriarch of Cilicia (Armenian), Lebanon

Bishop of Beirut {Bairut} (Armenian)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Nov 1934Born
28 Mar 195924.3Ordained PriestPriest of Institut du Clergé Patriarcal de Bzommar
3 Jan 197742.1AppointedApostolic Exarch of France (Armenian)
3 Jan 197742.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Amida degli Armeni
13 Feb 197742.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Amida degli Armeni
30 Jun 198651.6AppointedBishop of Sainte-Croix-de-Paris (Armenian), France
2 Feb 201378.2RetiredBishop of Sainte-Croix-de-Paris (Armenian), France
24 Jul 201580.6SelectedPatriarch of Cilicia (Armenian), Lebanon
25 Jul 201580.6ConfirmedPatriarch of Cilicia (Armenian), Lebanon
25 Jul 201580.6AppointedBishop of Beirut {Bairut} (Armenian), Lebanon
25 May 202186.5DiedPatriarch of Cilicia (Armenian), Lebanon

MicroData Summary for Grégoire Pierre XX (Krikor) Ghabroyan
Patriarch Grégoire Pierre XX (Krikor) Ghabroyan I.C.P.B. (born , died ) Patriarch of Cilicia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAlep, Archeparchy of Alep [Beroea, Halab] (Armenian), Syria
Ordained BishopS. Sauveur, Beirut, Archdiocese of Beirut {Bairut} (Armenian)
Death PlaceBeirut, Archdiocese of Beirut {Bairut} (Armenian)

  • a priest for 62.1 years
  • a bishop for 44.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 2 Feb 2013
  • ab: Bollettino, 25 Jul 2015
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 42, Number 2,803
  • d: CB, 25 May 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 26 Jun 2021

Quantcast