Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Vitale Galli

Deceased

Bishop of Narni, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Jun 1833Born
18 Sep 185825.2Ordained PriestPriest
5 Jul 187542.0AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Narni, Italy
5 Jul 187542.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Auzia
11 Jul 187542.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Auzia
9 Jan 187642.5SucceededBishop of Narni, Italy
12 Jul 188855.0DiedBishop of Narni, Italy

MicroData Summary for Vitale Galli (VIAF: 88951973)
Bishop Vitale Galli (born , died ) Bishop of Narni

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCagli
Ordained BishopS. Apollinaire, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 29.8 years
  • a bishop for 13.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1885
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 133, and Page 402
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1875, Number 41

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 11 Mar 2017