Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Prasad Gallela

Bishop Emeritus of Cuddapah, India


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Apr 1962 Born
1 Mar 198926.9Ordained PriestPriest of Kurnool, India
31 Jan 200845.8AppointedBishop of Cuddapah, India
1 Mar 200845.9Ordained BishopBishop of Cuddapah, India
10 Dec 201856.6ResignedBishop of Cuddapah, India

MicroData Summary for Prasad Gallela (VIAF: 283059166)
Bishop Prasad Gallela (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Cuddapah

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAdoni
Ordained BishopOn the Grounds of, Saint Mary's, Old, Cathedral, Cuddapah, Diocese of Cuddapah

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Cuddapah.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 31 Jan 2008
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 193, Number 15,682
  • r: Bollettino, 10 Dec 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 10 Dec 2018

Quantcast