Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Doraboina Moses Prakasam

Bishop of Nellore


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Oct 1957 BornMariampuram
7 Apr 198325.5Ordained PriestPriest of Cuddapah, India
26 Jul 200244.8AppointedBishop of Cuddapah, India
28 Aug 200244.9Ordained BishopBishop of Cuddapah, India
7 Dec 200649.2AppointedBishop of Nellore, India
17 Jan 200749.3InstalledBishop of Nellore, India

MicroData Summary for Doraboina Moses Prakasam:
Bishop Doraboina Moses Prakasam (born ) Bishop of Nellore

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Nellore.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 7 Dec 2006
  • i: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 168, Number 14,244

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013