Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Michele Fusco

Bishop of Sulmona-Valva, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Dec 1963 Born
25 Jun 198824.5Ordained PriestPriest of Amalfi-Cava de’ Tirreni, Italy
30 Nov 201753.9AppointedBishop of Sulmona-Valva, Italy
4 Jan 201854.0Ordained BishopBishop of Sulmona-Valva, Italy
4 Feb 201854.1InstalledBishop of Sulmona-Valva, Italy

MicroData Summary for Michele Fusco
Bishop Michele Fusco (born ) Bishop of Sulmona-Valva

EventPlace
Birth PlacePiano di Sorrento, Archdiocese of Sorrento
Ordained PriestPositano, Archdiocese of Amalfi-Cava de’ Tirreni
Ordained BishopCathedral, Amalfi, Archdiocese of Amalfi-Cava de’ Tirreni

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Sulmona-Valva.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 30 Nov 2017
  • ob: CB, 2 Dec 2017
  • c2: CB, 23 Dec 2017
  • c34: CB, 3 Jan 2018
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 234, Number 19,625

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast