Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Antonio Flores de Rivera

Deceased

Bishop of Nicaragua


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1703¹BornDurango, México
13 Mar 175350.1SelectedBishop of Nicaragua
23 Jul 175350.5ConfirmedBishop of Nicaragua
1 May 175451.3Ordained BishopBishop of Nicaragua
Dec 1756³53.9DiedBishop of Nicaragua

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for José Antonio Flores de Rivera:
Bishop José Antonio Flores de Rivera (born 1703, died Dec 1756) Bishop of Nicaragua

  • a bishop for 2.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1754, Number 17
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 308

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 16 Nov 2015