Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonin Fishta, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Apostolic Administrator of Pult, Albania

Titular Bishop of Amyzon


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Apr 1902Born
14 Aug 192725.3Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
17 Dec 195654.6AppointedApostolic Administrator of Pult, Albania
17 Dec 195654.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Amyzon
25 Apr 195755.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Amyzon
12 Jan 198077.7DiedApostolic Administrator of Pult, Albania

MicroData Summary for Antonin Fishta
Bishop Antonin Fishta O.F.M. (born , died ) Apostolic Administrator of Pult

EventPlace
Birth PlaceShkodrŽ

  • a priest for 52.4 years
  • a bishop for 22.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 188, Number 15,318

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018